Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Singleton, Jessica, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Bouchard, Jesse, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2019 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time94 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Order/Stipulation for Judge Pro Tem | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Declaration/Memorandum | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.