Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Roman, Monica, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Velazquez, Juan Pablo, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2017 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time22 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal | |
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte on Court's Own Motion
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Request Domestic Violence Restraining Order w/o Children | |
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Yuba County Sheriff Jurisdiction |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.