Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Parker, Sonja, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Willis, Anthony Dwayne, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2017 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time57 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Request | |
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of | |
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.