Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mccartney, Melissa Nicole, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Mccartney Jr, Gerald Dale, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time643 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Mediation Calendar
Judge: Conversion Error, . |
|
January 15, 2008 | Docket Event | FL Mediation Calendar | |
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Mediation Orientation
Judge: Conversion Error, . |
|
December 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Related Cases | |
December 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Confidential Clets Information |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.