Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The District Attorney, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 1996 |
Category(35) Unlimited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Historical Case - Ignore JBSIS Errors | |
April 14, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Calendar
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
April 14, 2005 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
January 27, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice to Dismiss on Court's Motion 5-Year | |
April 16, 1999 | Docket Event | Petition Filed | |
December 02, 1996 | Docket Event | Claim Opposing Forfeiture | |
December 02, 1996 | Docket Event | Add Pre-JBSIS Case (conversion) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.