Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
White, Gerald L, White, Shu C, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Peiffer, Carroll Edward, against Takhar, Harman, represented by Barrette, Michael R, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts Superior with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management181 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Order | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Trial Brief - Defendant | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application - No Fee | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.