Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Allen, Brian James, Allen, Leslie Hines, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Vasquez, David W, against Stockton, Joe B, Stockton, Marval L, represented by Peter, Donna J, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2017 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Cvcv) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time300 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal & Proof of Service | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Related Cases | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Objection - No Fee | |
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support | |
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities | |
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion - $60 Fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.