Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Higbee, George, Pool, Patti, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Miller Law Inc, against American Federation Insurance Company, Foremost County Mutual Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Co Grand Rapids Mi, Foremost Insurance Company, Foremost Insurance Group, (total of 8) See All represented by Greve Clifford Wengel & Paras, Party Defaulted, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Givens, Debra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGivens, Debra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2008 |
Category(37) Unlimited Other Contract |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time2294 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
August 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal & Proof of Service | |
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Long Cause
Judge: Jury, Trial |
|
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Dismiss With Prejudice | |
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Conference, Settlement |
|
July 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
July 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Dismiss With Prejudice | |
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion - Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.