Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
A Teichert & Son Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mcdonough Holland & Allen, against Feather Glen Homes Llc, Feather Glen Land Holding Co Llc, Financial Freedom Loans Inc, Lakemont Arboga Ll C, Lakemont Homes Inc, (total of 8) See All represented by Lowenthal, Jeffrey, Sproul Trost Llp, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management122 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2007 |
Category(37) Unlimited Other Contract |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1750 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Forfeited | |
August 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
June 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal & Proof of Service | |
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Long Cause
Judge: Jury, Trial |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - In Part | |
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Conversion Close |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.