Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kelsey, John, Kelsey, Barbara, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Rosenbaum, Victoria, represented by Peiffer, Carroll Edward, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Time To Trial42 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time140 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment SC | |
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Counsel | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Receipt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.