Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Joden Haulers Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Honey, Scott Erik, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
Time To Trial40 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Cycle Time390 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.