Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time850 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment SC | |
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion / Petition | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion / Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.