Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Kathleen R. O'Connor presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 03, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions102 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time102 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Decision and Notice of Decision - TBD | |
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.