We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
John Gary Leroux ,
filed a(n)
General Criminal -
Criminal
case
against
People Of The State Of California ,
in the jurisdiction of Riverside County.
This case was filed in
Riverside County
Superior Courts
Superior with Jorge C. Hernandez presiding.
Filing Date
July 18, 2022
Category
Petition To Terminate Sex Offender Registration
Last Refreshed
April 11, 2023
Filing Location
Riverside County, CA
Matter Type
General Criminal
Filing Court House
Superior
Defendants
People Of The State Of California
Other Parties
Sarah Ann Stockwell (Attorney)
Case Events for
John Gary Leroux v. People Of The State Of California
Date
Type
Description
March 24, 2023
Docket Event
Order on Petition to Terminate Sex Offender Registration (PC §290.5) on Petition to Terminate Sex Offender Registration JOHN GARY LEROUX
Get Document
March 20, 2023
Docket Event
Petition to Terminate Sex Offender Registration on Petition to Terminate Sex Offender Registration JOHN GARY LEROUX
Get Document
March 20, 2023
Docket Event
Petition Checklist on Petition to Terminate Sex Offender Registration JOHN GARY LEROUX
Get Document
March 13, 2023
Docket Event
Notice of Case Reassignment to Department
Get Document
March 13, 2023
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing on Petition to Terminate Sex Offender Registration on Petition to Terminate Sex Offender Registration JOHN GARY LEROUX
Get Document
December 01, 2022
Docket Event
Response by DA to Petition to Terminate Sex Offender Registration (PC §290.5) on Petition to Terminate Sex Offender Registration JOHN GARY LEROUX
Get Document
August 02, 2022
Docket Event
Proof of Service-Sex Offender Registration Termination (PC 290.5) on Petition to Terminate Sex Offender Registration JOHN GARY LEROUX
Get Document
July 25, 2022
Docket Event
Notice of Department Assignment
Get Document
July 18, 2022
Docket Event
Proposed Order re: Order on Petition to Terminate Sex Offender Registration (PC 290.5)
Get Document
July 18, 2022
Docket Event
Petition to Terminate Sex Offender Registration (PC §290.5)
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.