Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Norman, Amy B., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Norman, Gregory, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with Swift, Hugh K. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management122 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2008 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Time To Trial584 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions613 days |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time3874 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice re: payment of support & sub of payee | |
August 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
July 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Under submission | |
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Swift, Hugh K. |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Report on Mediation | |
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.