Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
311 Henderson Receivables Origination Ll filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2008 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1000 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Copies | |
October 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
October 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
September 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 31, 2008 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.