Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2023 |
Last RefreshedMarch 16, 2023 |
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/10/23 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: E CASE NO: CV2203702 PRESIDING: HON. ANDREW SWEET REPORTER: CLERK: §. HENDRYX PLAINTIFF: BRIGID O° HANRAHAN vs. DEFENDANT: ALMA VIA OF SAN RAFAEL, ET AL NATURE OF ... | |
March 15, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/10/23 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: E CASE NO: CV2203702 PRESIDING: HON. ANDREW SWEET REPORTER: CLERK: §. HENDRYX PLAINTIFF: BRIGID O° HANRAHAN vs. DEFENDANT: ALMA VIA OF SAN RAFAEL, ET AL NATURE OF ... | |
March 14, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/10/23 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: E CASE NO: CV2203702 PRESIDING: HON. ANDREW SWEET REPORTER: CLERK: §. HENDRYX PLAINTIFF: BRIGID O° HANRAHAN vs. DEFENDANT: ALMA VIA OF SAN RAFAEL, ET AL NATURE OF ... | |
March 12, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/10/23 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: E CASE NO: CV2203702 PRESIDING: HON. ANDREW SWEET REPORTER: CLERK: §. HENDRYX PLAINTIFF: BRIGID O° HANRAHAN vs. DEFENDANT: ALMA VIA OF SAN RAFAEL, ET AL NATURE OF ... | |
March 11, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/10/23 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: E CASE NO: CV2203702 PRESIDING: HON. ANDREW SWEET REPORTER: CLERK: §. HENDRYX PLAINTIFF: BRIGID O° HANRAHAN vs. DEFENDANT: ALMA VIA OF SAN RAFAEL, ET AL NATURE OF ... | |
March 10, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 03/10/23 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: E CASE NO: CV2203702 PRESIDING: HON. ANDREW SWEET REPORTER: CLERK: §. HENDRYX PLAINTIFF: BRIGID O° HANRAHAN vs. DEFENDANT: ALMA VIA OF SAN RAFAEL, ET AL NATURE OF ... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.