Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateMay 26, 2023 |
Last RefreshedJune 15, 2023 |
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 06/09/23 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: E CASE NO: CV2202307 PRESIDING: HON. ANDREW SWEET REPORTER: CLERK: PLAINTIFF: ANGELO FERRO vs. DEFENDANT: KAYLENE TATE NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MOTION — PURSUANT TO ... | |
June 14, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 06/09/23 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: E CASE NO: CV2202307 PRESIDING: HON. ANDREW SWEET REPORTER: CLERK: PLAINTIFF: ANGELO FERRO vs. DEFENDANT: KAYLENE TATE NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MOTION — PURSUANT TO ... | |
June 13, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 06/09/23 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: E CASE NO: CV2202307 PRESIDING: HON. ANDREW SWEET REPORTER: CLERK: PLAINTIFF: ANGELO FERRO vs. DEFENDANT: KAYLENE TATE NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MOTION — PURSUANT TO ... | |
June 11, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 06/09/23 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: E CASE NO: CV2202307 PRESIDING: HON. ANDREW SWEET REPORTER: CLERK: PLAINTIFF: ANGELO FERRO vs. DEFENDANT: KAYLENE TATE NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MOTION — PURSUANT TO ... | |
May 31, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 05/26/23 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: E CASE NO: CV2202307 PRESIDING: HON. ANDREW SWEET REPORTER: CLERK: PLAINTIFF: ANGELO FERRO VS. DEFENDANT: KAYLENE TATE NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MOTION — PURSUANT TO ... | |
May 30, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 05/26/23 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: E CASE NO: CV2202307 PRESIDING: HON. ANDREW SWEET REPORTER: CLERK: PLAINTIFF: ANGELO FERRO VS. DEFENDANT: KAYLENE TATE NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MOTION — PURSUANT TO ... | |
May 29, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 05/26/23 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: E CASE NO: CV2202307 PRESIDING: HON. ANDREW SWEET REPORTER: CLERK: PLAINTIFF: ANGELO FERRO VS. DEFENDANT: KAYLENE TATE NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MOTION — PURSUANT TO ... | |
May 28, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 05/26/23 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: E CASE NO: CV2202307 PRESIDING: HON. ANDREW SWEET REPORTER: CLERK: PLAINTIFF: ANGELO FERRO VS. DEFENDANT: KAYLENE TATE NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MOTION — PURSUANT TO ... | |
May 26, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 05/26/23 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: E CASE NO: CV2202307 PRESIDING: HON. ANDREW SWEET REPORTER: CLERK: PLAINTIFF: ANGELO FERRO VS. DEFENDANT: KAYLENE TATE NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MOTION — PURSUANT TO ... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.