Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Waddie Earnest, Individually, And On Behalf Of Other Aggrieved Employees Pursuant To The California Private Attorneys General Act, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Ontrac Logistics, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Waters, Robert T. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2024 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Employment |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Payment received by individually, Waddie Earnest in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 920335. | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Payment received by Inc. OnTrac Logistics in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 917087. | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Attorney, Sarah R. Boxer, retained for OnTrac Logistics, Inc. . | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of electronic service filed by OnTrac Logistics, Inc.. POS050 PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Enforcement Under the Private Attorneys General Act, California Labor Code 2698, ET Seq. filed by OnTrac Logistics, Inc.. ANSWER FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order on Notice of Related Cases, CRC 3.300(h) *NOT RELATED filed by Waddie Earnest, individually, and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act. ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Electronic Service filed by OnTrac Logistics, Inc.. POS050 PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Related Case filed by Waddie Earnest, individually, and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act. NOTICE FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt filed by Waddie Earnest, individually, and on behalf of other aggrieved employees pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act. POS015 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT CIVIL FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to OnTrac Logistics, Inc. served on 01/23/2024 by Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00. POS010 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED RECORD SEALED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.