Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Kyabarsi, Veera, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Black, Zior, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Jacot, Katy E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2024 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Case status updated to Disposed. | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing re: Court Trial held on March 18, 2024. | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/18/2024 01:30 PM . MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SMALL CLAIMS FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (SC) as to Zior Black served on 01/14/2024 by Personal Service. $99.00. SC104 PROOF OF SERVICE SMALL CLAIMS FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principle $ 10,000.00 and Costs $75.00, set for 03/18/2024 at 1:30 PM before Hon. David E. French in Department 3B. | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $12,500 filed by Kyabarsi, Veera. SC100 PLAINTIFF S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Case initiated. | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Payment received by Veera Kyabarsi in the amount of $75.00. Receipt number 898807. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.