Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Catamount Properties 2018, Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, Or Interest In The Property Described In The Complaint, As Does 1-10, Gomez, Cruz, Gomez, Ruben H., Meriwest Mortgage Company, A California Limited Liabilty Company, National Default Servicing Corporation, An Arizona Corporation, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2024 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Attorney, Michael A. Wrapp, retained for National Default Servicing Corporation, an Arizona corporation . | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Attorney, Michael A. Wrapp, retained for Meriwest Mortgage Company, a California limited liabilty company . | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Defendants verified answer to verified complaint filed by National Default Servicing Corporation, an Arizona corporation; Meriwest Mortgage Company, a California limited liabilty company. ANSWER FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Payment received by a Meriwest Mortgage Company in the amount of $870.00. Receipt number 911571. | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to Meriwest Mortgage Company, a California limited liabilty company served on 01/18/2024 by Substituted Service. $208.20. POS010 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to National Default Servicing Corporation, an Arizona corporation served on 01/17/2024 by Personal Service. $163.90. POS010 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/10/2024 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 07/10/2024 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. RESET CLERKS ERROR | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Payment received by LLC, Catamount Properties 2018 in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 898673. | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Attorney, Elaine Soong, retained for Catamount Properties 2018, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.