Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Munoz, Anastacio Lupe, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Goolsby, Justin, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Jacot, Katy E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2024 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil - Civil Harassment |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Case status updated to Disposed. | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Dismissal - Other Entered as of 02/29/2024 | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing re: OSC Re: Harassment held on February 29, 2024. | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 02/29/2024 01:30 PM . MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Proof of Service as to Justin Goolsby served on 01/17/2024 by Personal Service. $0.00. -Service of form #CH-110 is marked only. CH200 SP PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Anastacio Lupe Munoz. CH109 NOTICE OF COURT HEARING CIVIL HARASSMENT PREVENTION FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 02/29/2024 at 1:30 PM before Hon. David E. French in Department 3B. | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 01/12/2024. CH110 SP TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Civil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party. CIVILRESTRAININGORDERNOTICETOFILINGPARTY RTF FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Munoz, Anastacio Lupe. CM010 CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED RECORD SEALED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.