Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Marquez Jr, Rafael, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Rivera, Johnathan, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Jacot, Katy E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacot, Katy E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2024 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil - Civil Harassment |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Case status updated to Disposed. | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing re: OSC Re: Harassment held on February 29, 2024. | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 02/29/2024 01:30 PM . MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Dismissal - Other Entered as of 02/29/2024 | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) as to Johnathan Rivera served on 02/05/2024 by Personal Service. $50.00. CH200 SP PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 02/29/2024 at 1:30 PM before Hon. David E. French in Department 3B. | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Rafael Marquez Jr. CH109 NOTICE OF COURT HEARING CIVIL HARASSMENT PREVENTION FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 01/11/2024. CH110 SP TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Case initiated. | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Marquez Jr, Rafael. CH100 REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED RECORD SEALED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.