Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Bradley, Shana Renee, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Bruce, Jessica Rae, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Jacot, Katy E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacot, Katy E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2024 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil - Civil Harassment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed by Bruce, Jessica Rae. CH250 PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE BY MAIL FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Bruce, Jessica Rae. CH120 RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Proof of Service as to Jessica Rae Bruce served on 01/11/2024 by Personal Service. $0.00. CH200 SO PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Renee Shana Bradley. CH109 NOTICE OF COURT HEARING CIVIL HARASSMENT PREVENTION FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 02/22/2024 at 1:30 PM before Hon. David E. French in Department 3B. | |
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 01/09/2024. CH110 SO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Civil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party. CIVILRESTRAININGORDERNOTICETOFILINGPARTY RTF FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Bradley, Renee Shana. CH100 REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bradley, Renee Shana. CM010 CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Case initiated. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.