Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Ramirez, Christina, filed a(n) Civil Harrassment case against Valenzuela, Angelina, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Rosenberg, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRosenberg, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2024 |
CategoryCivil Harrassment |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial: Court Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance : Petitioner |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Denied | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Harassment
Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED CHRISTINA RAMIREZ BY MAIL WITH RESPONSE CH-120 ON 01/23/24 |
|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESP RESPONSE TO REQ FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDERS |
|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COURT ORDER FEE WAIVER SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED ANGIE VALENZUELA ON 1/13/24 WITH CH-109; CH-110; CH-100; CH-120; CH-120-INFO |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Denied Restraining Order DENIED TRO |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.