Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Thomas, Lisa Gabrielle, filed a(n) Civil Harrassment case against Benefield, Barbara, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with David Rosenberg presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Rosenberg Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2024 |
CategoryCivil Harrassment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Harassment Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE; FILED BY LISA GABRIELLE THOMAS |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing Civil Harassment/TRO SIGNED 1/25/24 |
|
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Harassment Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE FOR REVIEW |
|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment, CH-100 | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment DEPT 14 |
|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.