Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Jose Bahena, Individually, And On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Empire Workforce Solutions, Pflug Packaging & Fulfillment, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Other Employment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Attorney Information filed by Empire Workforce Solutions; Pflug Packaging & Fulfillment, Inc.. NOTICE FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference Per email 1/17/24, set for 06/20/2024 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation & Order to Continue Case Management Conference entered and filed. STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Payment received by individually, Jose Bahena in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 898876. | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Dismissal of Plaintiff's Individual and Class Allegations Without Prejudice filed by Jose Bahena, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated. ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer of Defendants Atlantic Solutions Group, Inc and PFLUG Packaging & Fulfillment, Inc. to Plaintiff Jose Bahena's First Amended Class and Representative Action Complaint filed by Pflug Packaging & Fulfillment, Inc.; Empire Workforce Solutions. ANSWER FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 02/21/2024 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Continued per Order signed on 12/06/2023, and was scheduled on 12/15/2023 at 8:45 AM has been Continued to 2/21/2024 | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Joint Stipulation and Order To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Jose Bahena, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated. ORDER FILED RECORD SEALED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.