Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Villarreal, Erica, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Cortes Rodriguez, Luis Alberto, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Waters, Robert T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWaters, Robert T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Auto Tort |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Failure to File Default , set for 03/25/2024 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CCP 177 5 FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on January 23, 2024. | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 01/23/2024 08:30 AM . MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED CLERK S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 01/23/2024 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for CMC: Proof of Service/ Publication held on 10/24/2023 08:30 AM . MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing re: CMC: Proof of Service/ Publication held on October 24, 2023. | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to Luis Alberto Cortes Rodriguez served on 03/16/2023 by Personal Service. $35.00. *#7./E. is incomplete POS010 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: CMC: Proof of Service/ Publication , set for 10/24/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on August 21, 2023. | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/21/2023 08:30 AM . MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.