Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Stephens Mechanical Corporation, A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Altagas Ripon Energy, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Kronlund, Barbara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Result: Vacated | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Case status updated to Disposed. | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Stephens Mechanical Corporation, a California Corporation, Altagas Ripon Energy, Inc., a Delaware Corporation Entered. CIV110 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Stephens Mechanical Corporation, a California Corporation. CIV110 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Stephens Mechanical Corporation, a California Corporation. CIV110 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Release of Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens) filed by Stephens Mechanical Corporation, a California Corporation. RELEASE OF NOTICE FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons as to Altagas Ripon Energy, Inc., a Delaware Corporation served on 02/27/2023 by Personal Service. $65.00. POS010 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lis Pendens filed by Stephens Mechanical Corporation, a California Corporation. NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/21/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT SCHEDULING INFORMATION FILED RECORD SEALED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.