Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Ramos Panzo, Josefina, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Mardini, Tameem presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMardini, Tameem Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Name Change |
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by Ramos Panzo, Josefina. NC121 PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Case status updated to Disposed. | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition for Change of Name filed by Josefina Ramos Panzo, Brandon Quijano Ramos is Granted NC130 DECREE CHANGING NAME FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing re: OSC- Change of Name held on June 30, 2023. | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for OSC- Change of Name held on 06/30/2023 11:00 AM . MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of service filed by Ramos Panzo, Josefina. PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing regarding: OSC- Change of Name , set for 06/30/2023 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Tameem Mardini in Department 3A. | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for OSC- Change of Name held on 05/12/2023 11:00 AM . MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | OSC- Change of Name scheduled on 05/12/2023 at 11:00 AM has been Continued. | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: OSC- Change of Name , set for 05/12/2023 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Tameem Mardini in Department 3A. NC120 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED RECORD SEALED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.