Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Garcia, Maria, Garcia-Ortega, Miguel, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Garcha, Jasvir Singh, Garcha Truck Repair, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Joaquin County. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts with Waters, Robert T. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Non-Pi/Pd/Wd (Other) Tort |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Joaquin County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Result: Vacated | |
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Case status updated to Disposed. | |
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Miguel Garcia-Ortega, Maria Garcia, Garcha Truck Repair, Inc., Jasvir Singh Garcha Entered. CIV110 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Garcia-Ortega, Miguel; Garcia, Maria. | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 01/12/2024 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Failure to Appear , set for 01/12/2024 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. NOTICE OF HEARING FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/07/2023 08:30 AM . MINUTE_ORDER RTF FILED RECORD SEALED CLERK S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on November 7, 2023. | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement filed by Garcia-Ortega, Miguel; Garcia, Maria. CM 110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED RECORD SEALED |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney, Chris Nguyen, retained for Garcha Truck Repair, Inc. . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.