Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Fergal Ruan vs Madelene Sciortino,Rosetta Hanser,James Hanser
A 22: Unlimited Auto case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. Judge Fall, Timothy L. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 08, 2023
Last Refreshed
April 09, 2024
Filing Location
Yolo County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
22: Unlimited Auto
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause /Case Management Conference Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance by counsel |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY DEFENDANT MADELENE JEWEL SCIORTINO, ROSETTA OR |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SUBSERVED ROSETTA OR HANSER WITH SUMMONS COMPLAINT AND RELATED DOCUMENTS ON 1/2/2024 AND MAILED ON 1/3/2024 |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SUBSERVED JAMES HANSER WITH SUMMONS COMPLAINT AND RELATED DOCUMENTS ON 1/2/2024 AND MAILED ON 1/3/2024 |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED MADELENE JEWEL SCIORTINO WITH SUMMONS COMPLAINT AND RELATED DOCUMENTS IN PERSON ON 1/2/2024 |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited FILED BY ATTNY FOR DEFS MADELENE JEWEL SCIORTINO, ROSETTA HANSER, JAMES HANSER Answer |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable) FILED BY ATTNY FOR DEFS MADELENE JEWEL SCIORTINO, ROSETTA HANSER, JAMES HANSER Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable) |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE FALL |
|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
First Paper Filed - Fee COMPLAINT |
|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed ISSUED |