Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Torres-Ramondo, Samantha, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Hale, Michael E, against Ecobrite Services Llc, Ikea Distribution Services Inc., Ikea Holding Us, Ikea Property Inc., Ikea Purchasing Services, (total of 7) See All represented by Goodman, Eric, Roth, David V, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Rosenberg, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Case Management Conference
Date: December 06, 2021*Case Management Conference
Date: April 04, 2022*Case Management Conference
Date: July 10, 2023*Motion
Date: May 09, 2023*Motion
Date: January 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury
Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury 7 days Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Review Possible Settlement Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY PLAINTIFF TORRES-RAMONDO |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY IKEA US RETAIL LLC |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY DEFENDANT, ECOBRITE SERVICE, LLC. |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney CHRISTOPHER CAMPBELL IN PLACE OF DAVID V. ROTH AND GABRIELLA PEDONE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.