Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Mitchell, Krista, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Krause, Ernest, against Banks, Keith M., Bikoba, Veronique N., Pakpour Banks Llp, Rutaganira, Thomas F., Wigeri Van Edema, Dawn, (total of 5) See All represented by Foos, David P, Phillips, Robert K, Sommer, Jason J, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2021 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Motion
Date: June 29, 2023*Motion
Date: October 07, 2022*Case Management Conference
Date: April 24, 2023*Case Management Conference
Date: October 24, 2022*Motion
Date: June 09, 2022*Order to Show Cause
Date: April 03, 2023*Motion
Date: October 07, 2022*Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 15, 2023*Motion
Date: March 08, 2022*Motion
Date: October 07, 2022*Motion
Date: September 29, 2022*Motion
Date: December 08, 2021*Motion
Date: June 29, 2023*Ex Parte
Date: March 27, 2024*Order to Show Cause
Date: April 06, 2023*Ex Parte
Date: April 04, 2024*Motion
Date: May 14, 2021*Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 01, 2024*Motion
Date: April 28, 2023*Case Management Conference
Date: June 07, 2021*Motion
Date: June 07, 2023*Motion
Date: May 25, 2021*Motion
Date: September 28, 2022*Motion
Date: May 28, 2021*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Date: March 27, 2023*Motion
Date: June 07, 2023*Motion
Date: June 29, 2023*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Date: March 22, 2023*Motion
Date: June 07, 2023*Ex Parte
Date: April 09, 2021*Demurrer / Motion to Strike
Date: April 13, 2021*Motion
Date: November 05, 2021*Motion
Date: October 08, 2021*Motion
Date: November 10, 2021*Motion
Date: July 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury (3 days) Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
May 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Motion FOR SANCTIONS Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Motion
Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Motion Judgment on the Pleadings Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Ex Parte DEFT REQ TO CONT MTN FOR JDGMT ON PLEADINGS Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance by all counsel |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Lodged Documents | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED DAVID P. FOOS, ESQ. AND RACHEL DOTY, ESQ. ON 4/03/24 WITH PLAINTIFF KRISTA MITCHELL'S OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S EX PARTE AND DECLARATION OF ATTY ENEST KRAUSE ISO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S EX PARTE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.