Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wilshire Commercial Capital, Llc Dba Wilshire Consumer Credit, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Alexandryan, Edit, against Archibeque, Alicia Marie, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
Category06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Case Management Conference
Date: January 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance ATTY MORRIS |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY PLAINTIFFS |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service SERVED ALICIA ARCHIBEQUE W/ SUMMONS AND CMPLT ON 1/20/2021 | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed Summons |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE DANIEL M WOLK |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.