Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Holy Rosary Catholic Church, filed a(n) 43: Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) case against Wells, Brodie Troop, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2020 |
Category43: Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Date: January 29, 2021*Order to Show Cause
Date: March 12, 2021*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Date: April 09, 2021*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Date: May 07, 2021*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Date: June 11, 2021*Review
Date: August 12, 2021*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Date: January 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Review RE: COURT EXPENSES Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY SHERINE PAHLAVAN | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition Workplace Violence Restraing Order Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Restraining Order After Hearing EXPIRES 6/11/2024 AT 5:00 PM |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing Civil Harassment/TRO TO 6/11/2021 |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE WOLK |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Received ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.