Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rocha, Cristan Sally, filed a(n) 43: Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2020 |
Category43: Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time97 days |
*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Date: October 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Decree CHANGING NAME |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof / Affidavit of Publication THE NEWS LEDGER: 9-23-2020, 9-30-2020, 10-7-2020, 10-14-2020 |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents DECREE CHANGING NAME |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause NAME CHANGE |
|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE WOLK |
|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE MCADAM OSC |
|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) FOR CRISTAN ROCHA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.