Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 11/10/21 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: CV2000038 PRESIDING: HON. JAMES T. CHOU REPORTER: CLERK: JOEY DALE PLAINTIFF: PACIFIC POOLS, INC. VS. DEFENDANT: AQUA GUNITE, INC., ET AL NATURE OF PROC... | |
November 15, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 11/10/21 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: CV2000038 PRESIDING: HON. JAMES T. CHOU REPORTER: CLERK: JOEY DALE PLAINTIFF: PACIFIC POOLS, INC. VS. DEFENDANT: AQUA GUNITE, INC., ET AL NATURE OF PROC... | |
November 14, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 11/10/21 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: CV2000038 PRESIDING: HON. JAMES T. CHOU REPORTER: CLERK: JOEY DALE PLAINTIFF: PACIFIC POOLS, INC. VS. DEFENDANT: AQUA GUNITE, INC., ET AL NATURE OF PROC... | |
November 13, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 11/10/21 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: CV2000038 PRESIDING: HON. JAMES T. CHOU REPORTER: CLERK: JOEY DALE PLAINTIFF: PACIFIC POOLS, INC. VS. DEFENDANT: AQUA GUNITE, INC., ET AL NATURE OF PROC... | |
November 12, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 11/10/21 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: CV2000038 PRESIDING: HON. JAMES T. CHOU REPORTER: CLERK: JOEY DALE PLAINTIFF: PACIFIC POOLS, INC. VS. DEFENDANT: AQUA GUNITE, INC., ET AL NATURE OF PROC... | |
November 11, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 11/10/21 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: CV2000038 PRESIDING: HON. JAMES T. CHOU REPORTER: CLERK: JOEY DALE PLAINTIFF: PACIFIC POOLS, INC. VS. DEFENDANT: AQUA GUNITE, INC., ET AL NATURE OF PROC... | |
November 10, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 11/10/21 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: CV2000038 PRESIDING: HON. JAMES T. CHOU REPORTER: CLERK: JOEY DALE PLAINTIFF: PACIFIC POOLS, INC. VS. DEFENDANT: AQUA GUNITE, INC., ET AL NATURE OF PROC... | |
October 12, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 10/06/21 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: CV2000038 PRESIDING: HON. JAMES T. CHOU REPORTER: CLERK: JOEY DALE PLAINTIFF: PACIFIC POOLS, INC. vs. DEFENDANT: AQUA GUNITE, INC., ET AL NATURE OF PROC... | |
October 11, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 10/06/21 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: CV2000038 PRESIDING: HON. JAMES T. CHOU REPORTER: CLERK: JOEY DALE PLAINTIFF: PACIFIC POOLS, INC. vs. DEFENDANT: AQUA GUNITE, INC., ET AL NATURE OF PROC... | |
October 10, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | DATE: 10/06/21 TIME: 1:30 P.M. DEPT: B CASE NO: CV2000038 PRESIDING: HON. JAMES T. CHOU REPORTER: CLERK: JOEY DALE PLAINTIFF: PACIFIC POOLS, INC. vs. DEFENDANT: AQUA GUNITE, INC., ET AL NATURE OF PROC... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.