Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Millea, Amanda, against Landry, James, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with John M. Gallagher presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2015 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time360 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event | First Paper Filed - Fee | |
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Document Filed | |
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
July 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.