Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Watsonville Community Hospital, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gordon, Amy L, against Frandeen, Megan, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Burdick, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions372 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time372 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ/Abstract Received | |
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Conditional Settlement Stay Lifted | |
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Court | |
December 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default and Uncontested Filed | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal of Does | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.