Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Watsonville Community Hospital, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gordon, Amy L, against Cortez, Pedro, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with John M. Gallagher presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management364 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time455 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.