Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Watsonville Community Hospital, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gordon, Amy L, against Arcilla, Jesus, Arcilla, Josephine, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management364 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions239 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time239 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | ||
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk | |
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | ||
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.