Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Watsonville Community Hospital, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gordon, Amy L, against Mendoza, Teresa, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Paul M. Marigonda presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time360 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
|
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Conditional Settlement Stay Lifted | |
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement Filed | |
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 26, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
December 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.