Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lopez, Tiffany M, against Plageman, Lawrence, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time142 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Public Historical Documents | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event | ||
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs (Summary/Appeal) | |
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Document Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.