Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Layman, Patrick, against Hernandez, Yvette, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions444 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time444 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk | |
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default and Uncontested Filed | |
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Filed | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (Complaint/Petition/Claim) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.