Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Marigonda, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management360 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2014 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions325 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time325 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Dismissal | |
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Limited Up to $10k | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Cross Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.