Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fernandes, Manuel, Fernandes, Maria, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Maraldo, John, against Medina, Eduardo, Medina, Elizabeth, Medina, Isabel, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2014 |
Category(32) Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer: Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions89 days |
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time22 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ||
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ||
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | ||
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Request Filed | |
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ Returned | |
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event | ||
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.