Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Marin County. This case was filed in Marin County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMarin County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MOTION — FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DWANA BAIN [PLTF] JUDITH GOTTESMAN RULl'NG The court grants Plaintiff‘s unopposed motion for sanctions pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section...
Judge: JAMES Ti CHOU |
|
March 24, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL — NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR A NEW TRIAL [DEFT] DWANA BAIN RULING The motion for new trial by defendant Dwana Bain (“Defendant”) is denied. Defendant f...
Judge: JAMES Tl CHOU |
|
January 27, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: NOTICE OF MOTION — AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES [PLTF] JUDITH GOTTESMAN RULING Plaintiff Judith Gottesman’s Motion for Attorney’s Fees is GRANTED FACTUAL & PROCEDURAL BACKGROUND...
Judge: JAMES T. CHOU |
|
September 06, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: HEARING ON DEMURRER — TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [DEFT] DWANA BAIN RULING Defendant's demurrer to the First Amended Complaint is OVERRULED. REQUESTS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Defendan...
Judge: ANDREW SWEET |
|
April 19, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: HEARING ON DEMURRER 7 TO COMPLAINT [DEFT] DWANA BAIN RULING Defendant’s demurrer to the first and second causes of action on the ground of failure to state facts sufficient to co...
Judge: ANDREW SWEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.