Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Allen, Paul, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lighthill, Selby, against Del Real, Louis, Lambeth, John, represented by O'Hara, Brian C, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Gallagher, John presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management119 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi / Pd / Wd |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time364 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Document Received | |
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Further Case Management Conference | |
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | ||
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Filed | |
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Atack, Robert |
|
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Marigonda, Paul |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.