Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Flores, Javier, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Comstock, Austin B, against Andrade, Jorge Oseguera, Avila, Amalia A, Gonzales, Amalia E, represented by Vahidi, Azadeh J, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts with Burdick, Paul presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management118 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Time To Trial521 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions693 days |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time833 days |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: September 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing and Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Response | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing - Post Disposition
Judge: Gallagher, John |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order/Judgment Received | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.